Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Luna, Esmundo Jose, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Luna, Susan L, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Billingsley, Sara K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBillingsley, Sara K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2023 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedMay 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing CHAMBERS CONFERENCE - ALL ATTORNEYS |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing IN-PERSON Chambers Conference |
|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Drug Screen Results / Report (COLLECTED ON 01/12/2023) 90-DAY |
|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Drug Screen Results / Report (COLLECTED ON 01/12/2023) 180-DAY |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Drug Screen Results / Report (COLLECT ON 01/12/2023) 180-DAY |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Drug Screen Results / Report (COLLECT ON 01/12/2023) 90-DAY |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Drug Screen Results / Report (COLLECT ON 01/12/2023) APPROX 1 YEAR |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR SPONTANEOUS DRUG SCREEN AND ORDER RESETTING HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS SET FOR:JANUARY 26, 2023 AT 8:45AM |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Motion to Modify, Correct or Reform Temps |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR SPONTANEOUS DRUG SCREEN AND ORDER RESETTING HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS SET FOR JANUARY 26, 2023 AT 8:45 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.