Case Last Refreshed: 18 hours ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Phillips, Bailey Allison Nicole, represented by Mcleaish, Michael Louis, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 161st District Court with Low, Justin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLow, Justin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House161st District Court |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docketable Financial Note Crime Stoppers - Repayment of Reward Fine removed from financials, $0.00 charged to defendant per statutes (C.C.P. Art. 42A.301(b)(20) and C.C.P. Art. 37.073 & 42.152), financial adjustment authorized by Clarissa Webster. |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Payment of Court Appointed Attorney EMAILED TO M. MCCLEAISH AND AUDITORS ON 7/7/2021 BY S.C. |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION E- MAILED TO M. MCLEAISH ON 07/02/2021 BY HR |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF DISCOVERY (Plea) | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Guilty Plea Hearing | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS (Plea) | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
AGREEMENT OF JAIL TIME CREDIT 161 DAYS |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | TRIAL COURT'S CERTIFICATE | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note State announced ready defendant appeared with counsel and announced ready, admonished and plead guilty defendant found guilty and sentenced to 8 years in B-21-0243-CR Fine $50.00, CC $290.00, Reimb. $90.00. In B-21-0179-CR Fine $550.00, reimb. $80.00. Appeal waived. JWL |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF APPEAL (Plea) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.