Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Dickman, Amanda M., represented by Holmes, Mike, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 161st District Court with Low, Justin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLow, Justin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House161st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note State announced ready defendant failed to appear name called 3x at courthouse door no answer, bond forfeited and capias issued. JWL |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Guilty Plea Hearing | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note State announced ready defendant appeared with counsel and announced ready defendant admonished and plead guilty, finding of guilt deferred and placed on c/s for 5 years. Fine $1550.00 CC $ 290.00 Reimb $120.00. JWL |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant's Waiver of Right to a Jury Trial | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note State announced ready defendant appeared with counsel and announced ready, defendant admonished and waived jury trial case set for guilty plea on August 23, 2021 @ 11:00 A.M. JWL |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF GUILTY PLEA DATE SET FOR: 8/23/21 @ 11:00 AM. CC TO M.HOLMES, D.A, APO, & AMIGO'S BONDING BY L.N. |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Pre-Trial Conference | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note Final pretrial reset to August 4, 2021 at 9:00 A.M. JWL |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Pre-Trial Conference | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING SET FOR: 7/23/21 @ 9:30 AM. EMAILED TO D.A, M.HOLMES, & AMIGO'S BONDING ON 7/1/21 BY D.L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.