Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Shipman, Roger Neal, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 161st District Court with Low, Justin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLow, Justin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedJuly 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House161st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note State announced ready for trial defense announced ready for trial. JWL |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Pre-Trial Conference | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Pre-Trial Conference | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | First Pre-Trial Conference | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF PRE-TRIAL | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER REQUIRING DEEP-LUNG BREATH ANALYSIS MECHANISM DEVICE SUPERVISION FEE EMAILED TO D.A, D. SARABIA, & PSM ON 4/19/21 BY D.L. |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTIFICATION OF DEEP-LUNG ANALYSIS MECHANISM REQUIREMENT | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
AMENDED ORDER SETTING BOND WITH SPECIAL CONDITIONS CC; D.A., D. SARABIA, ASA BONDING AND PSM ON 03/31/21 BY L.T. |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | TRE 404(b) LETTER | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO D. SARABIA ON 3/26/21 BY D.L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.