Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kim, Chong, Kim, Jai, Kim, Thai S., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Benton, Jeffrey M., Kassab, Leon R, Mcconville, Nolan R, against Berrett Pest Control, Berrett Pest Control Corporate, Berrett Pest Control Services, Inc, represented by Fifield, Andrew Tucker, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with MOORE, MARICELA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOORE, MARICELA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 26, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: June 09, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
AGREED MTN DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS AGREED |
|
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER AGREED DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
162nd Jury Trial Reset Letter Non Jury Trial |
|
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DEPO BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS DISCOVERY |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINITFF 1ST AMENDED PETITION AMENDED PETITION 1ST |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT 1ST AMENDED ORIGINAL ANSWER AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL 1ST |
|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT NOTICE OF WRITTEN QUESTIONS DISCOVERY |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINITFF 1ST AMENDED NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS AFFIDAVIT 1ST AMENDED NOTICE OF FILING |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINITFF NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS AFFIDAVIT PL NOTICE OF FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.