Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Torres, Dora, filed a(n) Property case represented by Bauguss, James L, Iii, against Wal-Mart Stores Texas, Llc, represented by Johnson, David Aaron, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 68th District Court with HOFFMAN, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHOFFMAN, MARTIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
CategoryProperty |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House68th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 29, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 17, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 30, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 24, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: May 17, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: March 29, 2021NOTE - CLERKS
Date: September 24, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cover Sheet (General) NOTE - CLERKS ORDER DISMISS TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD SIGNED DISML ORDER TO CLERKS |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD DISML ORDER TO JUDGE FOR REV |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF FILING MEDICAL AFFIDAVITS FOR DORA TORRES |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - WAL-MART STORES TEXAS ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS JURY DEMAND JURY DEMAND |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION:WAL-MART STORES TEXAS, LLC RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION WAL-MART STORES TEXAS, LLC |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.