Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Allen, Rose, filed a(n) Property case represented by Bebawi, Jessica, Daspit, John Arthur, Du, Thompson, Klemm, David A., Syed, Ali, (total of 6) See All against Fox Fuels Transport Llc, Lucky Texas #2 Llc, represented by Ewing, Jerry L, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryProperty |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: March 26, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 26, 2021NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: April 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE DEPOSITION ROSE ALLEN CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION ROSE ALLEN |
|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
134th Trial Notice Letters Jury Trial - Civil |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED NOTE - CLERKS |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPSOED AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS AGREED |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORD AFFIDAVITS MOTION - LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORD AFFIDAVITS |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
(PROP) ORD GRANTING PLTF'S MTN FOR LV TO FILE HER NTC OF FILING BUSINESS RECORD AFFIDS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF, ROSE ALLEN'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE HER NOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORD AFFIDAVITS |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO STRIKE MOTION - STRIKE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S UNTIMELY MEDICAL AND BILLING AFFIDAVITS |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS - ATI THERAPHY (MEDICAL) |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF ROSE ALLEN NOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORDS AFFIDAVITS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.