Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wright, Chawanza, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Liebbe, Bill H, Sweeney, Paula Fisette, against Gray, John Headley, Md, Methodist Hospitals Of Dallas, represented by King, Jennifer A, Stephenson, Jon W, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, STACI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 26, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: June 04, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021 Special Setting |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER AMENDE NO EVIDENCE MSJ Motion - Summary Judgment SET BY BILL 903-253-4629 |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION CENTRE FOR NEURO SKILLS INC- BILLING |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
RE NOTICE OF HEARING CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER AMENDE NO EVIDENCE MSJ NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER ON MOTION PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED NO EVIDENCE AND TRADITIONAL MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTHVIONY OF AND EVIDENCE THAT PULMONARY EMBOLISM CAUSED PLAINTIFF'S INJURIES |
|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER TO STRIKE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE TESTIMONY OF CARL DAHLBERG, M.D. |
|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
NO EVIDENCE AND TRADITIONAL MSJ NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AMENDED |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION OF M. SHAWN SMITH, M.D. CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION OF M. SHAWN SMITH, M.D. |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION OF ROSECHELLE M. RUGGIERO, M.D. CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION ROSECHELLE M. RUGGIERO, M.D. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.