Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Middleton, Madeline, Middleton, Preston, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Khirallah, Rachel E, against Simpson Property Group, L.P., Uscmf Stoneledge Llc, represented by Klaes, Chaz D, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, STACI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This is a civil complaint filed in Texas District Court. The plaintiffs, Preston and Madeline Middleton, are suing the defendants USCMF Stoneledge LLC and Simpson Property Group, L.P. for negligence, gross negligence, and property damages. The plaint...
REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: April 05, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 26, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: June 04, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: March 31, 2021Motion - Compel
Date: November 01, 2021ORDER - PROTECT
Date: August 25, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 06, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 23, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 18, 2021MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 23, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: March 26, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 04, 2021MOTION - DISMISS
Date: October 14, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: May 03, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 28, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 07, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: April 05, 2021NOTE - CLERKS
Date: June 17, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 16, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 16, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: May 06, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 24, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
MAILED RACHEL KHIRALLAH COPY OF DISMISSAL ORDER NOTE - CLERKS MAILED COPY OF NONSUIT ORDER |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021 Jury Trial - Civil |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED ORDER TO COMPEL Motion - Compel *FLED 8/23/21 *SET BY RACHEL, 214/484-4699 |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
(PROPOSED) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' AND DEFENDANTS' AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE MOTION - DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' AND DEFENDANTS' AGREED/ WITH PREJUDICE |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE DEPOSITION ARIANNE KUHN CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION ARIANNE KUHN |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE DEPOSITION PEDRO PANAMENO CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION PEDRO PANAMENO |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER - PROTECT | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED ORDER TO COMPEL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION - COMPEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.