Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jackson, Kayla, Williams, Lee, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Burris, Stephen Brice, against Tk Elevator Corporation, T M Mian & Associates, Inc., T M Mian Partnership, Ltd, represented by Jones, Lamar L, Rucker, Alan Lawrence, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 192nd District Court with WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, KRISTINA M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House192nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 26, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 13, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: May 13, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 02, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 10, 2021AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 23, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 03, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: November 07, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 04, 2021Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: August 27, 2021Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: September 10, 2021NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: July 23, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: March 26, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: September 03, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 11, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 06, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: March 26, 2021ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: May 21, 2021MOTION HEARING
Date: May 17, 2021MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: April 30, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 11, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 30, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 26, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 09, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 05, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 03, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: June 28, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 21, 2021NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: January 06, 2022OBJECTION
Date: April 26, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 25, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 15, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 15, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 15, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: September 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 05, 2021MOTION - LEAVE
Date: April 11, 2022NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: January 07, 2022NOTE - CLERKS
Date: January 10, 2022ORDER - NONSUIT
Date: January 10, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 06, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 11, 2022Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: January 14, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 18, 2022NOTE - CLERKS
Date: August 29, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 26, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 27, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE DEPOSITION/LEE ELLA WILLIAMS CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION LEE ELLA WILLIAMS |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERT DEPO CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION KAYLA L. JACKSON |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERT DEPO CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION LEE E. WILLIAMS |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa Jury Trial - Civil |
|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL - STEPHEN BRICE BURRIS NOTE - CLERKS - MAILED COPIES/AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL/ALL PARTIES |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - AGREED ORDER DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED AGREED ORDER DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEPOSITION - LAURENT HOME HEALTH INC CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - LAURENT HOME HEALTH INC |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION RICHARD BOYD KARNES |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER/SUSTAININF PLTF OBJECTION/DEF LEAVE DESIGNATE 3RD PARTY NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED SUSTAINING PLAINTIFF OBJECTION/DEFENDANT LEAVE DESIGNATE 3RD PARTY |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION/PLTF OBJECTION/DEF LEAVE/DESIGNATE 3RD PARTY OBJECTION PLAINTIFF OBJECTION/DEFENDANTS LEAVE/DESIGNATE 3RD PARTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.