Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Humphrey, Shantwan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Greco, Shelly, Odetunde, Adewale, against Austin Idealease, L.L.C., Galvin, Sean, Keg1, Llc, Keg 1 O'Neal, Keg 1 O Neal, Llc, (total of 7) See All represented by Counts, Andrew G, Fee, Thomas W., Moye, William, Pela, Molly L, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with WHITMORE, BRIDGETT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITMORE, BRIDGETT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 26, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: May 20, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore Jury Trial - Civil |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION TEXAS RADIOLOGY ASSOCIATES, LLP CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION TEXAS RADIOLOGY ASSOCIATES, LLP |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - ALLIDBARTON SECURITY SERVICES EMPLOYMENT & PAYROLL CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION ALLIEDBARTON SECURITY SERVICES-EMPLOYMENT & PAYROLL |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SOUTHWESTERN MEDICAL CENTER AT DALLAS MEDICAL CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SOUTHWESTERN MEDICAL CENTER AT DALLAS-MEDICAL |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SOUTHWESTERN MEDICAL CENTER AT DALLAS CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SOUTHWESTERN MEDICAL CENTER AT DALLAS-RADIOLOGY |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - QUESTCARE PARTNERS/QUESTCARE MEDICAL SERVICES-BILLING CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION QUESTCARE PARTNERS/QUESTCARE MEDICAL SERVICES-BILLING |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - MEDICAL CITY LAS COLINAS-BILLING CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION MEDICAL CITY LAS COLINAS-BILLING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.