Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
On Deck Capital, Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Lansden, Tyler, Lansden, Tyler G., against Baker, David, Baker Investment Group Inc, represented by Clark, Robert M, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, STACI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: May 28, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 29, 2021MOTION - RETAIN
Date: April 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
MAILED ROBERT CLARK COPY OF NONSUIT ORDER NOTE - CLERKS MAILED COPY OF NONSUIT ORDER |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021 Non Jury Trial |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORDS AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORDS |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY RESPONSES MOTION - EXTEND DISCOVERY RESPONSES |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
(PROPOSED) ORDER ON MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY RESPONSES NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
101st Dismissal Letter - 2017 DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
VERIFICATION AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER TO RETAIN NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.