Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Pletta, Timothy G, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Pletta, Timothy Gerard, against Craftmade International, Inc., Dolan Northwest, Llc., represented by Illmer, Richard A, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with MOORE, MARICELA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOORE, MARICELA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Timothy G. Pletta, Trustee for and on behalf of the Ann Hennum & Timothy Gerard Pletta Revocable Trust ("Plaintiff") vs. d/b/a Craftmade ("Defendant"), jointly and severally, be cited to appear and answer and, upon fina...
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 10, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: May 19, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
162nd Cover Letter Non Jury Trial |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Cover Sheet (General) NOTE - CLERKS COPY ALL |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR O/NONSUIT TO JUDGE'S QUEUE |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NONSUIT | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER OF NONSUIT |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING ORDER | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT ORIGINAL ANSWER-DOLAN NORTHWEST, LLC CRAFTMADE ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - CRAFTMADE INTERNATIONAL, INC RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - DOLAN NORTHWEST, LLC RETURN OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.