Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cintas Corporation No. 2, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Russell, Allen D, against Twin City Security, Inc., represented by Emerick, Sam, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, STACI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 25, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: May 28, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021 Non Jury Trial |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE MAILED (2) NOTE - CLERKS |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED ORDER TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
101st Dismissal Letter - 2017 DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - TWIN CITY SECURITY, INC. ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO FILE CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
UNEXECUTED SOS CITATION - TWIN CITY SECURITY, INC. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.