Case Last Refreshed: 22 hours ago
Carles, Marlene, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lee, Ana K, against 9W Halo Opco L.P. D B A Angelica, Angelica Corporation, Perez, Frankie, represented by Geddie, Ryan K, Shayeb, Gabrielle M., Wooten, Nichole, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Plaintiff, Marlene Carles, filed this lawsuit against defendants Frankie Perez and Angelica Corporation, alleging negligence and vicarious liability. Specifically, Carles alleges that on June 13, 2019, she was traveling on US Highway 75 in Dallas Cou...
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 14, 2021VACATION LETTER
Date: July 19, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: March 25, 2021MOTION - LEAVE
Date: July 02, 2021MOTION - PROTECT
Date: June 18, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: April 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 13, 2021Motion - Leave
Date: September 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 05, 2021MOTION - LIFT ABATEMENT
Date: July 06, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: January 31, 2022ORDER - PROTECT
Date: June 26, 2021NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: July 18, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: April 29, 2021NOTE - CLERKS
Date: February 28, 2022NOTE - CLERKS
Date: July 20, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 06, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 08, 2021Final Disposition Hearing
Date: February 28, 2022ORDER - NEW TRIAL/SET ASIDE/VACATE (AJDG ) (OCA and REOPEN)
Date: July 19, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 14, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 28, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 05, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 02, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 13, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 03, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: April 27, 2021REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: April 08, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 25, 2021OBJECTION
Date: July 16, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: April 27, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 19, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 25, 2021ORDER - DENY
Date: September 24, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 24, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 18, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: December 02, 2021FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING
Date: January 27, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: July 19, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 22, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: April 08, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: June 18, 2021NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: April 02, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED(2) NOTE - CLERKS |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO LIFT ABATEMENT ORDER - NEW TRIAL/SET ASIDE/VACATE (AJDG ) (OCA and REOPEN) |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDE OF DISMISSAL |
|
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
AGREED MOTION TO LIFT ABATEMENT MOTION - LIFT ABATEMENT |
|
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER TO LIFT ABATEMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
ABATEMENT ORDER MAILED TO ALL (2) NOTE - CLERKS |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
134th Disposition Mondays Setting Final Disposition Hearing |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
(PROPOSED) AGREED ORDER OF ABATEMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
134th Trial Notice Letters Jury Trial - Civil |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.