Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Winston Water Cooler Of Jacksonville, Ltd., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jach, Anthony P, against First Community Bancshares , Inc., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2021 |
CategoryGarnishment |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: May 27, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 13, 2021APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: March 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
193RD Initial Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
COVER SHEET NOTE - CLERKS MAILED COVER SHEET AND ORDER OF NONSUIT TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTTORNEY |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT:FIRST COMMUNITY BANKSHARES INC D/B/A FIRST NATIONAL BANK TEXAS A/K/A FIRST CONVENIENCE BANK RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NONSUIT | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT FIRST COMMUNITY BANKSHARES INC D/B/A FIRST NATIONAL BANK TEXAS A/K/A FIRST CONVENIENCE BANK |
|
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE THOMAS SLEDGE D/B/A SELECT PLUMBING |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL PETITION APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT NOTICE: THOMAS SLEDGE D/B/A SELECT PLUMBING ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.