Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Investment Retrievers Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Tucker, Carl L, against Bank Of America N.A., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 160th District Court with REDMOND, AIESHA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREDMOND, AIESHA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2021 |
CategoryGarnishment |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court House160th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: May 25, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 18, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
COVER SHEET NOTE - CLERKS MAILED COVER SHEET AND ORDER OF NONSUIT TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
160th Dismissal DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION CASE FILED 3-24-21; DEF AND DEBTOR UNSERVED |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF NON-SUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER OF NON-SUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT:BANK OF AMERICA NA RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE SOLEDAD PATINO |
|
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT BANK OF AMERICA NA |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.