Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ahmed, Shelly, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Zaidi, Jibraeel, against Goal Transports Inc, Jacquez, Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with WHITMORE, BRIDGETT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITMORE, BRIDGETT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 24, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: May 27, 2021NOTE - CLERKS
Date: May 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
193RD Initial Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED NOTE - CLERKS |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER TO DISMISS |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS |
|
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION GOAL TRANSPORTS INC |
|
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION ANTHONY JACQUEZ |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
FP FILE DESK JURY DEMAND FORM JURY DEMAND |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ISSUE CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.