Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Jennifer Tharp, against Byrd, Khalil Allen Golston, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Boyer, R. Bruce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBoyer, R. Bruce Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE SENT OF COURT ORDER | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION RETURNED UNSERVED | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation BYRD, KHALIL ALLEN GOLSTON Unserved | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | CITATION BY CERTIFIED MAIL | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation-By Certified Mail BYRD, KHALIL ALLEN GOLSTON Served 09/28/2020 Response Due 10/19/2020 Returned 10/15/2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.