Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2020 |
CategoryWrit Of Habeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Stephens, Charles A., II) | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER (Judicial Officer: Stephens, Charles A., II ) | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ###### JUDGE'S DOCKET SHEET/NOTES ##### | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Enter Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Stephens, Charles A., II) Result: Passed Hearing | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SIGN | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.