Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Beversdorf, Daniel, Beversdorf, Nathaniel, Harrison, Jennifer, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Scott Braden, against Oliva, Andrea, Pittenger, Carlos, represented by Elizabeth Watson, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Waldrip, Dib presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWaldrip, Dib Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2020 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | DOCUMENT | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO RELEASE FUNDS | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | DOCUMENT | |
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ###### JUDGE'S DOCKET SHEET/NOTES ##### | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE SENT OF COURT ORDER | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE OF CLAIMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.