Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lee, Jordan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Benson, Thomas, Ezee Property, Llc, Jacobson, Robert, Zorowski, John, represented by Mark Craig, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2020 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | RULE 203 CERTIFICATION | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR CLERK'S RECORD | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ###### JUDGE'S DOCKET SHEET/NOTES ##### | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Judicial Officer: Peschel, Dwight E. ) | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion For Summary Judgment (10:00 AM) () Result: Granted | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSES | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.