Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bryan Housing Authority, filed a(n) Appeal From Lower Court - Civil case represented by Benn, Joshua J., against Peterson, Mary L, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Brantley, Roy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrantley, Roy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
CategoryAppeal From Lower Court - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | REGISTRY FUNDS | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | REGISTRY FUNDS | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER TO THE JUDGE | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | REGISTRY FUNDS | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | REGISTRY FUNDS | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Hearing | |
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event | EMAIL CORRESPONDENCE | |
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.