Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Harris, Anjelica filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Matthijetz, Isaac Douglas, represented by Andreski, Donald R., in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Hawthorne, Kyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHawthorne, Kyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 08, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER DISCHARGING DEFENDANT FROM COMMUNITY SUPERVISION | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Sanctions / Treatment | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Sanctions / Treatment | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Sanctions / Treatment | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER MODIFYING CONDITIONS OF COMMUNITY SUPERVISION | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver of Extradition | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Conditions of Community Supervision | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Conditions of Community Supervision | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR DEFERRED ADJUDICATION SIGNED | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Fingerprint Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.