Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Walker, Payton, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Barcus, James Hans, against Shiner Park, Llc, represented by Wynn, Forrest J., in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Hilburn, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHilburn, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Other Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT AS TO RULE 306A | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | RETENTION (DESTROY DATE) | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Signed Order | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Pull | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSEC ORD | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Pull | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Pull | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Pull | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.