Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Swift Financial Llc, F K A Swift Financial Corporation, As Servicing Agent, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Dushkin, Jay H., against Irvin, Kasey, Kasey Irvin D B A Irvin Structures, Kasey, Irvin Lane, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts 85th District Court with Hawthorne, Kyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHawthorne, Kyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
|
Filing Court House85th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Show Cause Hearing (OCA) | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | PRECEPT TO SERVE | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Precept to Serve | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | PRECEPT TO SERVE | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Show Cause Hearing (OCA) | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | PRECEPT TO SERVE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.