Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Adams, Reneshia, Stewart, Darrein, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Greco, Shelly, Jobin, Lauren, against Brooks, Justin, Fedex Corporation, Fedex Ground Package System, Inc., Sra Trucking, Inc., represented by Toles, William Marcus, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Brick, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrick, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Call Submission (no personal appearance) | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | RETENTION (DESTROY DATE) | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT AS TO RULE 306A | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Signed Order | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER TO THE JUDGE | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING RECORDS AND AFFIDAVITS | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | EMAIL CORRESPONDENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.