Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Koontz, Margie E filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Locke, Jim presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLocke, Jim Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2021 |
CategoryLetters Of Testamentary |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Approving Inventory | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Inventories Filed (OCA) | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Testamentary | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | OATH | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Probating | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Death and Other Facts | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation - Returned | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | WILL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.