Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Corley, Madison, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Elliott, Kenny presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElliott, Kenny Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Non-Traffic |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | DISMISSED | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Email Received | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Other | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Comment | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Conference with Judge | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Deferred Disposition | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION ISSUED | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | TEL-CALL | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | New Cases Filed (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.