Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The Barracks Townhomes, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Reynolds, Dustin Ridge, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Elliott, Kenny presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElliott, Kenny Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 11, 2021 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Service | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Eviction | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGEMENT FOR PLAINTIFF | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Service | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION ISSUED | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.