Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Perez, George, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Frank W. Robertson, against Ramirez, Marco Antonio, Toolco Specialty Rentals, Llc, represented by Paul R. Wilson, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Patrick E. Sebesta presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick E. Sebesta Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMay 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Agreed Resolution CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) Agreed Resolution |
|
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Entry of Judgment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Other CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) Other |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.