Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lakes At Highland Glen, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Russell, Antoine, Rahmaan-Russell, Kameelah, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Expedited Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Green Card Returned | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Green Card Returned | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Rahmaan-Russell, Kameelah Served 03/22/2021 9:00 AM Russell, Antoine Served 03/22/2021 9:00 AM Occupant of Served 03/22/2021 9:00 AM | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation by Certified Mail Rahmaan-Russell, Kameelah Served 03/22/2021 9:00 AM Anticipated Method Certified Mail Russell, Antoine Served 03/22/2021 9:00 AM Anticipated Method Certified Mail Occupant of Served 03/22/2021 9:00 AM Anticipated Method Certified Mail | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (1-10 Plaintiffs) (OCA) | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Request | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.