Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Aldape, Melissa Anne, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Mcguire, Prentiss, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Joe Patrick Bulanek presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoe Patrick Bulanek Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2021 |
CategoryPcr - Paternity/Parentage |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Order | |
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Default Judgment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bulanek, Patrick) 12/12/2023 Reset by Court to 01/05/2024 | |
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Z - AG - Intervention | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Response | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.