Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Stiles, Adam, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Richard J. Wallace, Iii, against White, Judy, represented by R.P. Matthew Allen, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Patrick E. Sebesta presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick E. Sebesta Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2022 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeNonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Agreed Resolution CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) Agreed Resolution |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Docket Call Agreed Resolution CANCELED Jury Docket Call (1:45 PM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) Agreed Resolution |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Entry of Judgment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Passed CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) Passed |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.