Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sterling Lakes Property Owners Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Noelle Hicks, against Branch, Mervin Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Patrick E. Sebesta presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick E. Sebesta Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Default Judgment (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Branch, Mervin Thomas Served 04/30/2021 | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Branch, Mervin Thomas Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.