Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cbc Settlement Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Nicholas R. O'Conner, against Doe, Jane, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Justin R. Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJustin R. Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedJune 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Justin R.) 04/19/2021 Reset by Court to 05/17/2021 05/17/2021 Reset by Court to 06/21/2021 | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Justin R.) | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (1-10 Plaintiffs) (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.