Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Neverson, Mishelle, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc., A Delaware Corporation, Emeritus Corporation, A Washington Corporation, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Holly, Carter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHolly, Carter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateMay 01, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
This complaint is an enforcement action under the Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act (PAGA) filed by Mishelle Neverson, an aggrieved employee, against Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc., Emeritus Corporation, and Does 1 through 10. The c...
Tentative Ruling published.
Date: January 11, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Neverson, Mishelle.
Date: May 01, 2017First Amended Complaint filed by Neverson, Mishelle.
Date: December 29, 2017Paga Enforcement Action filed by Neverson, Mishelle. Jury Trial Demanded.
Date: May 01, 2017Case Management Statement filed by Neverson, Mishelle.
Date: October 20, 2017Proof of service filed by Neverson, Mishelle.
Date: December 29, 2017Summons issued and filed.
Date: May 01, 2017Tentative Ruling published.
Date: October 15, 2018Order Appointing Official Reporter Pro Tempore filed.
Date: January 29, 2018Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 01/29/2018 08:45 AM .
Date: January 29, 2018Stipulation & Order t File First Amended Complaint entered and filed.- signed by Judge Holly
Date: December 05, 2017Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 10/30/2017 08:45 AM .
Date: October 30, 2017Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.
Date: May 01, 2017Case Management Statement filed by Neverson, Mishelle.
Date: January 07, 2022Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 02/16/2021 08:45 AM .
Date: February 16, 2021Minutes finalized for Motion held on 01/14/2021 09:00 AM .
Date: January 14, 2021Notice of Ruling filed by Neverson, Mishelle.
Date: January 15, 2021Notice of Hearing Re: Plaintiff Mishelle Neverson's Motion to Stay filed by Neverson, Mishelle.
Date: December 29, 2020Declaration of Bevin Pike in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to stay filed by Neverson, Mishelle.
Date: December 16, 2020Case Management Statement filed by Neverson, Mishelle.
Date: August 03, 2020Case Management Statement filed by Neverson, Mishelle.
Date: May 08, 2020Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 01/23/2020 08:45 AM .
Date: January 23, 2020Case Management Statement filed by Neverson, Mishelle.
Date: January 09, 2020Pltf's Objection to deft's Notice of Settlement filed by Neverson, Mishelle.
Date: October 25, 2019Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/24/2019 08:45 AM .
Date: October 24, 2019Case Management Statement filed by Neverson, Mishelle.
Date: March 12, 2019Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/19/2018 08:45 AM .
Date: December 19, 2018(Amended) Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail.
Date: November 08, 2018Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel held on 10/16/2018 08:45 AM .
Date: October 16, 2018Case Management Statement filed by Neverson, Mishelle.
Date: November 27, 2018Order Appointing Discovery Referee filed by San Joaquin County Superior Court.
Date: October 29, 2018Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 09/26/2018 08:45 AM .
Date: September 26, 2018Notice of Ruling filed by Neverson, Mishelle.
Date: July 30, 2018Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel held on 05/03/2018 09:00 AM .
Date: May 03, 2018Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel held on 05/29/2018 08:45 AM .
Date: May 29, 2018Proof of service filed by Neverson, Mishelle.
Date: April 17, 2018Notice of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motions to Compel filed by Neverson, Mishelle.
Date: April 17, 2018Tentative Ruling published.
Date: May 02, 2018Proof of service filed by Neverson, Mishelle.
Date: December 29, 2017First Amended Complaint filed by Neverson, Mishelle.
Date: December 29, 2017Case Management Statement filed by Neverson, Mishelle.
Date: October 20, 2017Paga Enforcement Action filed by Neverson, Mishelle. Jury Trial Demanded.
Date: May 01, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Neverson, Mishelle.
Date: May 01, 2017Summons issued and filed.
Date: May 01, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Brookdale Senior Living Communities, inc., a Delaware corporation; Emeritus Corporation, a Washington corporation. Case Management Statement Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Neverson, Mishelle. Case Management Statement Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 01/24/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on August 16, 2021.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTEORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 08/16/2021 08:45 AM . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Erin Guy Castillo Assigned. BATCH
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Result: Reassigned
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 08/16/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B.
Judge: Holly, Carter |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on February 16, 2021.
Judge: Holly, Carter |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTEORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 02/16/2021 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.