Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Strickland, Jason O, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Williams, Lorenzo, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Guy Castillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGuy Castillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil - Civil Harassment |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time58 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Disposed.
Judge: Johnson, William D. |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Finding filed.
Judge: Johnson, William D. |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: OSC Re: Harassment held on April 15, 2019.
Judge: Johnson, William D. |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 04/15/2019 01:30 PM .
Judge: Johnson, William D. |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Proof of Service as to Lorenzo Williams served on 04/06/2019 by Personal Service. $0.00.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 04/15/2019 at 1:30 PM before Hon. William D. Johnson in Department 6C.
Judge: Johnson, William D. |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 03/29/2019.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Jason O Strickland.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Payment received in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 404147.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.