Frazier, Robert Roy, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Gerry The Officer Saetern Has Gerry Information, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stocktonwith Guy Castillo presiding.
Case Number(Subscribe to View) Track Case Changes |
JudgeGuy Castillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil - Civil Harassment |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time61 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Disposed.
Judge: Johnson, William D. |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Finding filed.
Judge: Johnson, William D. |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 04/15/2019 01:30 PM .
Judge: Johnson, William D. |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: OSC Re: Harassment held on April 15, 2019.
Judge: Johnson, William D. |
|
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Proof of Service as to Gerry The officer Saetern has Gerry information served on 04/10/2019 by Personal Service. $0.00.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of service of Response by Mail filed by Gerry The officer Saetern has Gerry information. Proof of Service Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Gerry The officer Saetern has Gerry information. Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service filed by Frazier, Robert Roy. Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 04/15/2019 at 1:30 PM before Hon. William D. Johnson in Department 6C.
Judge: Johnson, William D. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.