Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cervantes, Claudia, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Rancho San Miguel, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Sparks, Sheryle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSparks, Sheryle Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2019 |
CategorySmall Claims |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions115 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time1007 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
MINUTEORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED RULING FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for Ruling on Submitted Matter held on 12/15/2016 03:00 PM . Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT SMALL CLAIMS FILED RECORD SEALED Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
SC109 AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR FILED RECORD SEALED Authorization to Appear filed by Rancho San Miguel. Authorization to Appear Judge: Orcutt, Charlotte |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
MINUTEORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 12/14/2016 01:30 PM . Judge: Orcutt, Charlotte |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: Court Trial held on December 14, 2016.
Judge: Orcutt, Charlotte |
|
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
SC104 PROOF OF SERVICE SMALL CLAIMS FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of Service (SC) as to Rancho San Miguel served on 10/01/2016 by Substituted Service. $0.00. Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $ 10,000.00 and Costs $75.00, set for 12/14/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17.
Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case initiated.
Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
SC100 PLAINTIFF S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED RECORD SEALED Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000 filed by Cervantes, Claudia. Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000 Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.