Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Progressive Select Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Gilstrap, Sarah, Gonzalez, Albert, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Kronlund, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKronlund, Barbara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2022 |
CategoryLimited Civil Auto Tort |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 01/17/2023 08:45 AM .
Date: January 17, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Progressive Select Insurance Company.
Date: July 15, 2022Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.
Date: July 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 05/18/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on January 17, 2023.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
MINUTE_ORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 01/17/2023 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Progressive Select Insurance Company. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
POS010 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of Service of Summons as to Albert Gonzalez served on 08/06/2022 by Substituted Service. $99.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 01/17/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUM100 SUMMONS CIVIL FILED RECORD SEALED Summons issued and filed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FILED RECORD SEALED Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Progressive Select Insurance Company. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED RECORD SEALED Statement of Damages filed by Progressive Select Insurance Company. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Attorney, Mark Robert Nivinskus, retained for Progressive Select Insurance Company .
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.