Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Drinkwine, Ashley, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Dennis, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Family Law Annex with Hoyt, Seth R. Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHoyt, Seth R. Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseFamily Law Annex |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Disposed.
Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W. |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissal-Other-Filing Denied as of 06/24/2022
Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W. |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: Domestic Violence Restraining Order held on June 24, 2022.
Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W. |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minutes finalized for Domestic Violence Restraining Order held on 06/24/2022 08:15 AM .
Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W. |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application for Telephonic Appearance at Hearing and Order filed by Daniel Dennis.
Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr. |
|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Sheriff (Fee Waived) Domestic Violence Documents as to Daniel Dennis served on 06/07/2022 by Personal Service. $0.00.
Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr. |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Domestic Violence Restraining Order TRO (Ashley Drinkwine) *NO POS, set for 06/24/2022 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Seth R. Hoyt Jr. in Department 4B.
Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr. |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 06/03/2022.
Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr. |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Ashley Drinkwine.
Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr. |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case initiated.
Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.