Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Dan Mcnamara filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case against None, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Staffel, Timothy J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStaffel, Timothy J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 13, 1985 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedJanuary 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2024 | Tentative Ruling |
Probate Notes: The court investigator’s report has been received and recommends that the conservatorship continue. No appearance is required. The next review hearing will be held on January 15, 2025, ...
Judge: Judge Patricia Kelly |
|
January 18, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Court Investigator’s Annual Review The court investigator’s report has been received and recommends that the conservatorship continue. No appearance is required. The next review...
Judge: Judge Timothy Staffel |
|
January 12, 2022 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Review: Investigator's Report Probate Notes: Probate notes will be updated on a rolling basis, generally five days before the hearing. If no probate notes are posted two days pr...
Judge: Judge Timothy Staffel |
|
January 12, 2022 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Review: Investigator's Report Probate Notes: The court investigator’s report has been received and recommends that the conservatorship continue. No appearance is required. The n...
Judge: Judge Timothy Staffel |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Review: Investigator's Report
Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
January 13, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Court Investigator’s Annual Review The court investigator’s report has been received and recommends that the conservatorship continue. No appearance is required. The next review...
Judge: Judge Timothy Staffel |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order re: Court Review - Probate Code 1850, Filed sent to calendar on 1/13/21 |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review: Investigator's Report
Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Confidential Supplemental Information, Filed Attachment A: Medical Information: Not to be disclosed to any party |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.