Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hernandez, Clarissa Marie, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Cynthia Ann Ludvigsen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia Ann Ludvigsen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 25, 1998 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: May 07, 2014Declaration Under UCCJEA filed
Date: November 27, 2013Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: May 09, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2017 | Hearing | Case Status Set to Closed Comment CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED | |
July 21, 2017 | Hearing | CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED | |
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED | |
August 21, 2014 | Hearing | Comment: Comment LOOSE FILES (DISMISSAL REPORT BY CFS PROBATE GAURD INVSTG) SENT TO RIVERSIDE SUPERIOR COURT. | |
August 21, 2014 | Hearing |
Comment: LOOSE FILES (DISMISSAL REPORT BY CFS PROBATE GAURD INVSTG) SENT TO RIVERSIDE SUPERIOR COURT. |
|
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Comment: LOOSE FILES (DISMISSAL REPORT BY CFS PROBATE GAURD INVSTG) SENT TO RIVERSIDE SUPERIOR COURT. |
|
August 12, 2014 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment HEARING RE: PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF GUARDIANSHIP | |
August 12, 2014 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment HEARING RE: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN | |
August 12, 2014 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Ludvigsen, Cynthia A Comment HEARING RE: STATUS OF TRANSFER TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY CYNTHIA LUDVIGSEN,JUDGE CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON;7137 COURT ATTENDANT C TURKAL COURT ATTENDANT C TURKAL - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW HEARING HELD OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: CASE HAS BEEN TRANSFERRED TO RIVERSIDE. VACATE PAPGD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/12/14 AT 10:30 IN DEPARTMENT S54G. VACATE PTGRD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/12/14 AT 10:30 IN DEPARTMENT S54G. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
August 12, 2014 | Hearing | Petition Hearing Original Type Petition Hearing Hearing Time 10:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment HEARING RE: PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF GUARDIANSHIP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.