We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Peter S. Thompson Vs. Karen L. Kilgariff

Case Last Refreshed: 6 hours ago

Thompson Peter S., filed a(n) Family - Divorce,Separation case against Kilgariff Karen L., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .

Case Details

Filing Date

January 18, 2013

Last Refreshed

November 30, 2022

Filing Location

Los Angeles County, CA

Category

Dissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

Practice Area

Divorce,Separation

Matter Type

Family

Case Cycle Time

619 days

Time to First Dismissal Order

584 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case Events

Type Description
Docket Event Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2014-09-29 )
Docket Event Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2014-09-29 )
Docket Event Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2014-09-29 )
Docket Event Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2014-09-29 )
Docket Event Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Thompson, Peter S. - Filed and Entered on 2014-09-05 )
Filed by Petitioner
Docket Event Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Thompson, Peter S. - Filed and Entered on 2014-09-05 )
Filed by Petitioner
Docket Event Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 09-04-14 )
Docket Event Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 09-04-14 )
Docket Event Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Thompson, Peter S. )
Filed by Petitioner
Docket Event Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Thompson, Peter S. - Filed and Entered on 2014-08-25 )
Filed by Petitioner
See all events