Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lattanzi Matthew V., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jessup Cindy L., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica Courthouse with Bobbi Tillmon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBobbi Tillmon Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 10, 2003 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time2036 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2009 | Hearing |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Lattanzi, Matthew ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 04, 2009 | Hearing |
Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Lattanzi, Matthew ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 04, 2009 | Hearing |
Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Lattanzi, Matthew ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 04, 2009 | Hearing |
Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Lattanzi, Matthew ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 04, 2009 | Hearing |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Lattanzi, Matthew ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 09, 2006 | Hearing |
Substitution of Attorney (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Lattanzi, Matthew - Filed and Entered on 2006-02-09 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 19, 2004 | Hearing |
Notice (NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Lattanzi, Matthew ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 02, 2004 | Hearing |
Notice - Change of Address (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Jessup, Cindy ) Filed by Respondent |
|
November 13, 2003 | Hearing |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Jessup, Cindy ) Filed by Respondent |
|
September 19, 2003 | Hearing |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Lattanzi, Matthew ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.