Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Beckes Street Housing Associates Lp, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Peake, Alan J, against Ordaz, Veronica, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2016 |
Category32-Cl <10K Unlawful Detainer - Residential - Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions42 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time39 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2016 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)
Judge: Benavides, Jose R., DelPellegrino, Victoria |
|
March 23, 2016 | Hearing |
Writ Returned Wholly Satisfied KERN COUNTY |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Wholly Satisfied KERN COUNTY |
|
March 22, 2016 | Hearing |
Judgment
Judge: Camacho, Marcos R. |
|
February 25, 2016 | Hearing | Memorandum of Costs | |
February 19, 2016 | Hearing |
Judgment ON THE PLEADINGS Judge: Camacho, Marcos R. |
|
February 19, 2016 | Hearing |
Writ of Possession Issued KERN COUNTY |
|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment ON THE PLEADINGS Judge: Camacho, Marcos R. |
|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued KERN COUNTY |
|
February 16, 2016 | Hearing |
Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)
Judge: Errea, Larry A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.