Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Thompson, Thomas, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Lovretovich, Joseph M., against Horizon Direct Inc, represented by Richardson, Lyne A, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Barbara A. Lane presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbara A. Lane Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2005 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Case Cycle Time2987 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed pursuant to GC 68152(d) 1 or 2 | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 21 effective 01/20/2013. | |
June 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 06/24/2012. | |
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 45 effective 03/29/2012. | |
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event | 04/26/2007: EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO ENFORCE SETLLEMENT BY THOMAS THOMPSON Hearing: OFF-CALENDAR | |
April 19, 2007 | Docket Event | 04/19/2007: EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO ENFORCE SETLLEMENT BY THOMAS THOMPSON Hearing: CONTINUED NOT HEARD | |
April 18, 2007 | Docket Event | 04/18/2007: Ex-Parte Application TO ENFORCE SETLLEMENT filed by THOMAS THOMPSON | |
April 18, 2007 | Docket Event | 04/18/2007: Uniform Civil Filing Fee Paid by THOMAS THOMPSON (Ex parte application requiring a party to give notice of the ex parte appearance to other parties - Civil) Receipt Number: 704180078 for $40.0 | |
March 28, 2007 | Docket Event | 03/28/2007: Superior Jury Trust Refund Receipt Number: 703280112 for $150.0 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.