Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Levko, Vitaliy, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Bedrik, Val, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Reed, David W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReed, David W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time42 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2015 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
March 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Destroyed EXHIBITS DESTROYED |
|
May 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment ACK SATISFY JDGM Notes: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT |
|
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC OF ENTRY JDGM SC Notes: AND CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO ALL PARTIES. |
|
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Case/Cause Under Submission for Decision TAKEN UND SUBMISSION |
|
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL PLTFF PRESENT DEF PRESENT Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: VAL BEDRIK DBA: HEMI EXPRESS INC ON 1-7-08 BY SUB-SERVICE. FEE: $30.00. |
|
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.