Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ramos Oil Co Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Winslow, Walter V, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Reed, David W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReed, David W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions2733 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time2733 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: DISMISSING CASE FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION OF ACTION | |
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss NO APPEARANCES CASE DISMISSED FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION OF ACTION Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLKS CERT OF MAIL |
|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minute Comment DROPPED FR CALENDAR Notes: AT REQUEST OF: COURT NEITHER PARTY PRESENT |
|
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL PLTFF NP DEF NP Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
February 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
December 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.